Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Chimoio, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop of Maputo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1947 BornBúzi-Sofala
9 Dec 197932.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
5 Dec 200053.0AppointedBishop of Pemba, Mozambique
25 Feb 200153.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pemba, Mozambique
22 Feb 200355.2AppointedArchbishop of Maputo, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Francisco Chimoio:
Archbishop Francisco Chimoio O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Archbishop of Maputo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Maputo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,920

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013