Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Nampula

Archidioecesis Nampulensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Tomé Makhweliha, S.C.I., Archbishop
  • Manuel Vieira Pinto, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 4 June 1984
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Mozambique
  • Square Kilometers: 51,000 (19,698 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesenampula.org/
  • Mailing Address: Paco Arquiepiscopal, C. Postal 84, 70100 Nampula, Mocambique
  • Telephone: (06)21.30.24/5
  • Fax: 21.41.94

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Nampula
4 September 1940ErectedTerritorial Prelature of Mozambico Diocese of Nampula (erected)
5 April 1957Territory LostDiocese of Nampula Diocese of Porto Amélia (erected)
21 July 1963Territory LostDiocese of Nampula Diocese of Vila Cabral (erected)
Archdiocese of Nampula
4 June 1984ElevatedDiocese of Nampula Archdiocese of Nampula
11 October 1991Territory LostArchdiocese of Nampula Diocese of Nacala (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Nampula
194931,0411,919,7671.6%4707441951574ap1951
1970224,3421,850,00012.1%1275872,5781051258ap1971
1980248,7521,973,00012.6%638445,6531568252ap1981
Archdiocese of Nampula
1990295,3403,003,0009.8%640466,4205711555ap1991
1999245,8452,000,00012.3%1726435,7174014336ap2000
2000261,8332,000,00013.1%1722396,7135415636ap2001
2001274,6782,000,00013.7%2027475,8446514837ap2002
2002493,0162,300,00021.4%2050707,0439511037ap2003
2003307,2142,600,00011.8%2330535,7967813837ap2004
2004308,1112,700,00011.4%3631674,5988214437ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 25 Aug 2012