Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Inácio Saúre, I.M.C.

Archbishop of Nampula, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1960 Born
7 Jan 199534.8ProfessedMember of Consolata Missionaries
15 May 199838.2Perpetual VowsMember of Consolata Missionaries
8 Dec 199838.7Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
12 Apr 201151.1AppointedBishop of Tete, Mozambique
22 May 201151.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tete, Mozambique
5 Jun 201151.2InstalledBishop of Tete, Mozambique
11 Apr 201757.1AppointedArchbishop of Nampula, Mozambique
11 Jun 201757.2InstalledArchbishop of Nampula, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Inácio Saúre
Archbishop Inácio Saúre I.M.C. (born ) Archbishop of Nampula

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalama

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Nampula.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • Bollettino, 12 Apr 2011
  • ob/i/c2+: CB, 23 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,063
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Apr 2017
  • i: CB, 5 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Jun 2017