Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diamantino Guapo Antunes, I.M.C.

Bishop of Tete, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1966 Born
19 Sep 199326.8Perpetual VowsMember of Consolata Missionaries
5 Dec 199327.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Consolata Missionaries
20 Jul 199427.6Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
22 Mar 201952.3AppointedBishop of Tete, Mozambique
12 May 201952.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tete, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Diamantino Guapo Antunes (VIAF: 284089654)
Bishop Diamantino Guapo Antunes I.M.C. (born ) Bishop of Tete

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbergaria dos Doze, Diocese of Leiria, Portugal
Ordained DeaconCuamba, Diocese of Lichinga
Ordained PriestFatima, Diocese of Leiria-Fátima, Portugal
Ordained BishopOutdoors, Near, Cathedral, Tete, Diocese of Tete

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tete.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Mar 2019
  • ob: CB, 22 Mar 2019
  • c2: CB, 11 Apr 2019
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2019
  • 10.11.loc: AM, 8 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Jul 2019

Quantcast