Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Claudio Dalla Zuanna, S.C.I.

Archbishop of Beira, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1958 Born
29 Sep 197819.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
24 Apr 198223.4Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
23 Jun 198425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
29 Jun 201253.6AppointedArchbishop of Beira, Mozambique
7 Oct 201253.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Beira, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Claudio Dalla Zuanna
Archbishop Claudio Dalla Zuanna S.C.I. (born ) Archbishop of Beira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Argentina

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Beira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: CB, 30 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,601

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018