Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucio Andrice Muandula

Bishop of Xai-Xai


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1959 BornMaputo
14 May 198929.6Ordained PriestPriest of Xai-Xai, Mozambique
24 Jun 200444.7AppointedBishop of Xai-Xai, Mozambique
24 Oct 200445.0Ordained BishopBishop of Xai-Xai, Mozambique
7 Nov 200445.1InstalledBishop of Xai-Xai, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Lucio Andrice Muandula:
Bishop Lucio Andrice Muandula (born ) Bishop of Xai-Xai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Xai-Xai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,706

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013