Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Lerma Martínez, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gurué, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1944Born
2 Oct 196622.4ProfessedMember of Consolata Missionaries
2 Oct 196925.4Perpetual VowsMember of Consolata Missionaries
20 Dec 196925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
24 Mar 201065.8AppointedBishop of Gurué, Mozambique
30 May 201066.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gurué, Mozambique
13 Jun 201066.1InstalledBishop of Gurué, Mozambique
24 Apr 201974.9DiedBishop of Gurué, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Francisco Lerma Martínez
Bishop Francisco Lerma Martínez I.M.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Gurué

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Palmar, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Maputo, Archdiocese of Maputo
Death PlaceMaputo, Archdiocese of Maputo

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,653
  • d: CB, 24 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 25 Apr 2019

Quantcast