Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel de Medeiros Guerreiro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nampula, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1891Born
24 Aug 191322.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 193745.9AppointedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
15 Aug 193746.3Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
2 Mar 195159.8AppointedBishop of Nampula, Mozambique
30 Nov 196675.6RetiredBishop of Nampula, Mozambique
30 Nov 196675.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Praecausa
27 Jan 197179.7ResignedTitular Bishop of Praecausa
10 Apr 197886.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Nampula, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Medeiros Guerreiro
Bishop Manuel de Medeiros Guerreiro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nampula

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagoa, Portugal

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018