Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Custódio Alvim Pereira

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lourenço Marques, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1915Born
18 Dec 193722.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 195843.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lourenço Marques, Mozambique
20 Dec 195843.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nepte
8 Mar 195944.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nepte
3 Aug 196247.4AppointedArchbishop of Lourenço Marques, Mozambique
26 Aug 197459.5ResignedArchbishop of Lourenço Marques, Mozambique
12 Nov 200691.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lourenço Marques, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Custódio Alvim Pereira
Archbishop Custódio Alvim Pereira (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lourenço Marques

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão João do Monte, Portugal

  • a priest for 68.9 years
  • a bishop for 47.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 14
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast