Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Niza Ribeiro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of João Belo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1916BornProença a Velha, Portugal
18 May 194023.6Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 196246.2AppointedBishop of Tete, Mozambique
24 Mar 196346.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tete, Mozambique
19 Feb 197255.4AppointedBishop of João Belo, Mozambique
31 May 197659.7ResignedBishop of João Belo, Mozambique
19 Jan 198972.3DiedBishop Emeritus of João Belo, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Félix Niza Ribeiro:
Bishop Félix Niza Ribeiro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of João Belo

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013