Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Teodosio Clemente Cardinal de Gouveia

Deceased

Archbishop of Lourenço Marques, Mozambique

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1889Born
19 Apr 191929.9Ordained PriestPriest of Funchal, Portugal
18 May 193647.0AppointedPrelate of Mozambico, Mozambique
18 May 193647.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
5 Jul 193647.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leuce
18 Jan 194151.6AppointedArchbishop of Lourenço Marques, Mozambique
18 Feb 194656.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194656.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
6 Feb 196272.7DiedArchbishop of Lourenço Marques, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Teodosio Clemente de Gouveia
Teodosio Clemente Cardinal de Gouveia (born , died ) Archbishop of Lourenço Marques

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Jorge de Madeira, Portugal

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
  • a cardinal for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast