Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Nunes Teixeira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Quelimane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1910BornBeduido Estarreja, Portugal
6 Aug 193323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Beira, Mozambique
6 Feb 195545.0AppointedBishop of Quelimane, Mozambique
13 May 195545.3Ordained BishopBishop of Quelimane, Mozambique
23 Dec 197565.9ResignedBishop of Quelimane, Mozambique
2 Mar 199989.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Quelimane, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Francisco Nunes Teixeira:
Bishop Francisco Nunes Teixeira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Quelimane

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013