Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernesto Maguengue

Auxiliary Bishop of Nampula

Titular Bishop of Furnos Minor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1964 BornChidenguele
14 May 198924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Maputo, Mozambique
24 Jun 200439.9AppointedBishop of Pemba, Mozambique
24 Oct 200440.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pemba, Mozambique
14 Nov 200440.3InstalledBishop of Pemba, Mozambique
27 Oct 201248.2ResignedBishop of Pemba, Mozambique
6 Aug 201450.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nampula, Mozambique
6 Aug 201450.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Minor

MicroData Summary for Ernesto Maguengue:
Bishop Ernesto Maguengue (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Nampula

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Nampula.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,707
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 6 Aug 2014