Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Germano Grachane, C.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Nacala, Mozambique

Apostolic Administrator of Gurué


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1942 Born
24 May 197028.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
22 Jan 199047.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nampula, Mozambique
22 Jan 199047.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thunusuda
3 Jun 199048.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thunusuda
11 Oct 199149.4AppointedBishop of Nacala, Mozambique
25 Apr 201875.9RetiredBishop of Nacala, Mozambique
13 Jun 201977.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Gurué, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Germano Grachane (VIAF: 161944439)
Bishop Germano Grachane C.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nacala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZandamela
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de Fatima, Cathedral, Nampula, Archdiocese of Nampula

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nacala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,536
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2018
  • ab: CB, 15 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast