Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulo Mandlate, S.S.S.

Bishop Emeritus of Tete, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1934 Born
6 Jan 196833.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
31 May 197642.3AppointedBishop of Tete, Mozambique
26 Sep 197642.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tete, Mozambique
18 Apr 200975.2RetiredBishop of Tete, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Paulo Mandlate
Bishop Paulo Mandlate S.S.S. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tete

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacupalane-Manjacaze

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tete.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 2 Jan 2017