Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco João Silota, M. Afr.

Bishop Emeritus of Chimoio, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1941 Born
11 Aug 197433.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
18 Jan 198846.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Beira, Mozambique
18 Jan 198846.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Musti
26 Jun 198847.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Musti
19 Nov 199049.4AppointedBishop of Chimoio, Mozambique
2 Jan 201775.5RetiredBishop of Chimoio, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Francisco João Silota (VIAF: 19353519)
Bishop Francisco João Silota M. Afr. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Chimoio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZuoya

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chimoio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,724
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 2 Jan 2017