Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hilário da Cruz Massinga, O.F.M.

Bishop of Quelimane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1958 BornBanze
9 Jan 199435.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
5 Apr 200344.8AppointedBishop of Lichinga, Mozambique
15 Jun 200345.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lichinga, Mozambique
29 Jun 200345.0InstalledBishop of Lichinga, Mozambique
25 Jan 200849.6AppointedBishop of Quelimane, Mozambique
30 Mar 200849.8InstalledBishop of Quelimane, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Hilário da Cruz Massinga:
Bishop Hilário da Cruz Massinga O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Quelimane

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Quelimane.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,411

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013