Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elio Giovanni Greselin, S.C.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Lichinga, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1938 Born
29 Sep 195617.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
23 Jun 196526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
30 Dec 200870.1AppointedBishop of Lichinga, Mozambique
22 Mar 200970.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lichinga, Mozambique
8 Feb 201576.2RetiredBishop of Lichinga, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Elio Giovanni Greselin
Bishop Elio Giovanni Greselin S.C.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lichinga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTretto di Venza, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lichinga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,074
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018