Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Norbert Brunner

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1942 BornNaters
6 Jul 196826.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
1 Apr 199552.8AppointedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
9 Jun 199553.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Norbert Brunner:
Bishop Norbert Brunner (born ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sion {Sitten}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,564

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 11 Jan 2014; data: 11 Jan 2014