Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emil Paul Tscherrig

Apostolic Nuncio to Argentina

Titular Archbishop of Voli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1947 BornUnterems, Switzerland
11 Apr 197427.2Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 199649.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Voli
4 May 199649.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Burundi
27 Jun 199649.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Voli
8 Jul 200053.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
8 Jul 200053.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominica, Antilles
8 Jul 200053.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Jamaica, Antilles
8 Jul 200053.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Grenada, Antilles
8 Jul 200053.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guyana, Antilles
8 Jul 200053.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Saint Lucia, Antilles
8 Jul 200053.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Saint Vincent and Grenadines, Antilles
8 Jul 200053.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bahamas, Antilles
20 Jan 200154.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Barbados, Antilles
20 Jan 200154.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Antigua and Barbuda, Antilles
20 Jan 200154.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Suriname, Antilles
1 Jun 200154.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Saint Kitts and Nevis, Antilles
22 May 200457.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Korea
17 Jun 200457.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mongolia
26 Jan 200861.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sweden
26 Jan 200861.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Denmark
26 Jan 200861.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Finland
26 Jan 200861.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Iceland
26 Jan 200861.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Norway
5 Jan 201264.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina

MicroData Summary for Emil Paul Tscherrig:
Archbishop Emil Paul Tscherrig (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Argentina

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Argentina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,763
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013