Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to Korea



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Giovanni Gaspari, Apostolic Nuncio
  • Osvaldo Padilla, Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Nunciature
  • Elevated: 31 December 1963
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: Korea, Republic of
  • Mailing Address: Jongno-gu, 19 Jahamun-ro 26-gil, Seoul 03047, Korea
  • Telephone: (82-2)736.5725; 739.2310
  • Fax: 736.5738

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Delegation to Korea
7 April 1949EstablishedDelegation to Korea
Nunciature to Korea
31 December 1963ElevatedDelegation to Korea Nunciature to Korea (to Internunciature)
5 September 1966ElevatedNunciature to Korea (to Nunciature)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Delegation to Korea
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 42, Page 327
  • Nunciature to Korea
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 58, Page 875

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 29 May 2024