Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Saverio Zupi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Malta

Titular Archbishop of Serra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1914BornCerisano
19 Dec 193622.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Oct 196046.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Korea
28 Oct 196147.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serra
14 Jan 196248.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Serra
31 Jan 196248.1AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Pakistan
27 Dec 196552.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Pakistan
30 Aug 196652.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Turkey
17 May 196955.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Malta
14 Nov 196955.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Malta
1 Mar 198369.1DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Malta

MicroData Summary for Saverio Zupi:
Archbishop Saverio Zupi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Malta

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013