Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ippolito Rotoli

Deceased

Apostolic Pro-Nuncio to Japan

Titular Archbishop of Thibiuca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1914BornSezze Romano
20 Jun 193722.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Sep 196753.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thibiuca
2 Sep 196753.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Korea
8 Dec 196753.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thibiuca
15 Nov 197258.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Ethiopia
10 Jan 197459.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Japan
4 Oct 197763.0DiedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Japan

MicroData Summary for Ippolito Rotoli:
Archbishop Ippolito Rotoli (born , died ) Apostolic Pro-Nuncio of Japan

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015