Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Bianconi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1886Born
9 Apr 191226.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 194559.2AppointedBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
2 Sep 194559.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
11 Sep 197690.4RetiredBishop of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
5 Sep 198195.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Bianconi
Bishop Giulio Bianconi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePriverno

  • a priest for 69.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018