Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Egano Cardinal Righi-Lambertini

Deceased

Official of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1906BornCasalecchio di Reno, Italy
25 May 192923.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
28 Dec 195751.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Korea
9 Jul 196054.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Doclea
9 Jul 196054.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lebanon
28 Oct 196054.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Doclea
9 Dec 196357.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
8 Jul 196761.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Italy
23 Apr 196963.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
197467.8AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
197972.8AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
30 Jun 197973.3Elevated to Cardinal
30 Jun 197973.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana
26 Nov 199084.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
4 Oct 200094.6DiedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Egano Righi-Lambertini:
Egano Cardinal Righi-Lambertini (born , died ) Official of Roman Curia - Other

  • a priest for 71.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
  • a cardinal for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1960, Number 107
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015