Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfred Xuereb

Apostolic Nuncio to Korea

Titular Archbishop of Amantea

Apostolic Nuncio to Mongolia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1958 Born
26 May 198425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Gozo, Malta
3 Mar 201455.3AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat for the Economy
26 Feb 201859.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Korea
26 Feb 201859.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mongolia
26 Feb 201859.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amantea
19 Mar 201859.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amantea

MicroData Summary for Alfred Xuereb (VIAF: 305115003)
Archbishop Alfred Xuereb (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Korea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGozo, Diocese of Gozo, Malta
Ordained PriestCathedral, Gozo, Diocese of Gozo, Malta
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Korea.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 26 Feb 2018
  • c34: CB, 19 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,694

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast