Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Gaspari

Apostolic Nuncio to Angola

Titular Archbishop of Alba Maritima

Apostolic Nuncio to São Tomé and Príncipe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1963 Born
4 Jul 198724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Pescara-Penne, Italy
21 Sep 202057.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Angola
21 Sep 202057.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to São Tomé and Príncipe
21 Sep 202057.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Alba Maritima
17 Oct 202057.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Alba Maritima

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Gaspari
Archbishop Giovanni Gaspari (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Angola

EventPlace
Birth PlacePescara, Diocese of Penne e Pescara, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Angola.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2020
  • c1: CB, 21 Sep 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 17 Oct 2020

Quantcast