Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Bulaitis

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Albania

Titular Archbishop of Narona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1933BornLondon, Great Britain
2 Feb 195824.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kaišiadorys, Lithuania
21 Nov 198148.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Narona
21 Nov 198148.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Congo, Republic of
21 Nov 198148.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Chad
21 Nov 198148.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Central African Republic
6 Jan 198248.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Narona
11 Jul 198754.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Iran
30 Nov 199158.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Korea
8 Sep 199259.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mongolia
25 Mar 199763.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Albania
26 Jul 200875.0RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Albania
25 Dec 201077.4DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Albania

MicroData Summary for John Bulaitis
Archbishop John Bulaitis (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Albania

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 2 May 2016