Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Sye Cheong-duk

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Daegu {Taegu}

Titular Bishop of Buffada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1937BornPisan-dong
6 Jan 196224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)
3 Feb 199456.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)
3 Feb 199456.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Buffada
8 Apr 199456.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buffada
15 Oct 200164.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)
22 Dec 200164.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Alexander Sye Cheong-duk:
Bishop Alexander Sye Cheong-duk (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Daegu {Taegu}

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,310
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013