Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristoforo Palmieri, C.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Rrėshen, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1939 Born
18 Mar 196727.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
5 Feb 200060.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rrėshen, Albania
23 Nov 200566.4AppointedBishop of Rrėshen, Albania
28 Dec 200566.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rrėshen, Albania
15 Jun 201778.0RetiredBishop of Rrėshen, Albania

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Palmieri
Bishop Cristoforo Palmieri C.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Rrėshen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBitonto, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rrėshen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,023
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017