Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Rrėshen

Dioecesis Rrėsheniensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Cristoforo Palmieri, C.M., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 7 December 1996
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tiranė-Durrės
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Albania
  • Square Kilometers: 4,000 (1,545 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Ipeshkevia, Kishė Katedrale Katolike, Rruga Shen Vincenc de Paoli, 4601 Rrėshen, Shqipėria
  • Telephone: (216)22.539
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Abbey of Shėn Llezhri i Oroshit (Orosh)
25 December 1888ErectedTerritorial Abbey of Shėn Llezhri i Oroshit (Orosh) (erected)
Diocese of Rrėshen
7 December 1996ErectedArchdiocese of Durrės-Tiranė
Territorial Abbey of Shėn Llezhri i Oroshit (Orosh) (suppressed)
Diocese of Rrėshen (erected)
25 January 2005Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Rrėshen (from Shkodr‰)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Abbey of Shėn Llezhri i Oroshit (Orosh)
195018,510131141,32217ap1951
Diocese of Rrėshen
199970,000259,00027.0%7710,00081017ap2000
200070,000260,00026.9%7710,00081417ap2001
200165,000250,00026.0%5513,0006145ap2002
200260,000240,00025.0%14512,00051417ap2003
200355,000235,00023.4%4486,87541617ap2004
200457,000240,00023.8%4378,14231817ap2005
201055,200240,70022.9%84124,60042617ap2011
201455,300241,00022.9%3586,91252410ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.9, 4 May 2015; Data: 20 May 2015