Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franco Illia

Deceased

Archbishop of Shkodrė


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1918BornJubani
18 Dec 194325.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Dec 199274.8AppointedArchbishop of Shkodrė, Albania
25 Apr 199375.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Shkodrė, Albania
22 Oct 199779.6DiedArchbishop of Shkodrė, Albania

MicroData Summary for Franco Illia:
Archbishop Franco Illia (born , died ) Archbishop of Shkodrė

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,067
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015