Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bl. Nikollė Vinēenc Prennushi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1885Born
19 Mar 190822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
27 Jan 193650.3AppointedBishop of Sapė, Albania
19 Mar 193650.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sapė, Albania
26 Jun 194054.8AppointedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
19 Mar 194963.5DiedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
5 Nov 2016Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Nikollė Vinēenc Prennushi (VIAF: 45113300)
Archbishop Bl. Nikollė Vinēenc Prennushi O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShkodrė, Archdiocese of Shkodrė
Ordained BishopCathedral, Shkodrė, Archdiocese of Shkodrė
Death PlaceDurrės, Archdiocese of Durrės (Durazzo)

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,234
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1936, Number 15
  • beat: CB, 14 Jul 2016
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 48, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 78, Number 6,340, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast