Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gjergj Volaj

Deceased

Bishop of Sapė, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1904Born
27 Jun 193025.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 194035.7AppointedBishop of Sapė, Albania
8 Sep 194035.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sapė, Albania
3 Apr 194843.5DiedBishop of Sapė, Albania

MicroData Summary for Gjergj Volaj
Bishop Gjergj Volaj (born , died ) Bishop of Sapė

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShiroka
Ordained BishopSapė, Diocese of Sapė

  • a priest for 17.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1940
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1940, Number 51
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 78, Number 6,341

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast