Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leone Giovanni Battista Nigris

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Albania

Titular Archbishop of Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1884BornAmpezzo, Italy
18 Jul 190924.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Aug 193853.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
18 Aug 193853.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Albania
25 Sep 193854.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
1947²62.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Albania
21 Sep 196480.0DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leone Giovanni Battista Nigris:
Archbishop Leone Giovanni Battista Nigris (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Albania

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015