Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Paulini

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1862BornFormeaso, Zuglio
22 Dec 188826.3Ordained PriestPriest of Udine, Italy
11 Sep 191149.0AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
8 Dec 191149.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
10 Mar 191956.5AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
24 Feb 194582.4DiedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Paulini:
Bishop Luigi Paulini (born , died ) Bishop of Concordia (Sagittaria)

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013