Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Costantini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luni o La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1880Born
18 Mar 190524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
8 Feb 192948.5AppointedBishop of Luni o La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
5 May 192948.7Ordained BishopBishop of Luni o La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
26 Jul 194362.9ResignedBishop of Luni o La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy
26 Jul 194362.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
17 May 195675.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Luni o La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Costantini
Archbishop Giovanni Costantini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Luni o La Spezia, Sarzana e Brugnato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastions di Zoppola

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast