Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Isola

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

Titular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1850Born
Jun 1874³23.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 189645.5AppointedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
5 Jul 189645.5Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
14 Feb 191968.1ResignedBishop of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
14 Feb 191968.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade
21 Dec 192676.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Isola (VIAF: 262344991)
Bishop Francesco Isola (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Concordia (Sagittaria)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontenars, Archdiocese of Udine
Ordained BishopSacro Cuore di Gesų a Castro Pretorio, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 222
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 38
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017