Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giosuč Cattarossi

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno e Feltre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1863BornCornale
31 Mar 188824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Udine, Italy
11 Apr 191148.0AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
28 May 191148.1Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
21 Nov 191350.6AppointedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
3 Mar 194480.9DiedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giosuč Cattarossi:
Bishop Giosuč Cattarossi (born , died ) Bishop of Belluno e Feltre

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 44, and Page 83
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013