Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Foschiani

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1848Born
26 Oct 190860.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
26 Oct 190860.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Flavias
22 Nov 190860.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flavias
3 Jul 191062.1SucceededBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
5 Oct 191365.3DiedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Foschiani
Bishop Giuseppe Foschiani (born , died ) Bishop of Belluno e Feltre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGemona

  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 83
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast