Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Preng (Prend) Doši

Deceased

Abbot of ShŰn Llezhri i Oroshit (Orosh), Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1846Born
1871²24.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Dec 188842.8AppointedAbbot of ShŰn Llezhri i Oroshit (Orosh), Albania
22 Feb 191771.0DiedAbbot of ShŰn Llezhri i Oroshit (Orosh), Albania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Preng (Prend) Doši (VIAF: 45189852)
Abbot Preng (Prend) Doši (born , died ) Abbot of ShŰn Llezhri i Oroshit (Orosh)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBulgŰr

  • a priest for 46.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • op/d: CB, 18 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast