Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pasquale Trosksi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Skopje, Macedonia

Titular Archbishop of Nacolia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1850Born
10 Jan 189343.0AppointedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
5 Mar 189343.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
29 Apr 190858.3ResignedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
8 May 190858.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nacolia
28 Jul 191767.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Skopje, Macedonia

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Trosksi
Archbishop Pasquale Trosksi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Skopje

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDurrŽs, Archdiocese of DurrŽs (Durazzo), Albania
Ordained BishopShkodrŽ, Archdiocese of ShkodrŽ, Albania
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 505
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,640
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1893, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017