Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raffaele d’Ambrosio, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Durrës (Durazzo), Albania

Titular Archbishop of Achrida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1810Born
1830¹19.9ProfessedMember of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
1834²23.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
17 Dec 184737.8AppointedArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo), Albania
25 Feb 184838.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo), Albania
27 Nov 189282.8RetiredArchbishop of Durrës (Durazzo), Albania
14 Jul 189383.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Achrida
1901¹90.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Durrës (Durazzo), Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raffaele d’Ambrosio
Archbishop Raffaele d’Ambrosio O.F.M. Ref. (born , died 1901) Archbishop Emeritus of Durrës (Durazzo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoscoreale, Italy

  • a priest for 67.0 years
  • a bishop for 52.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 73, and Page 254
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast