Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Dodmassei

Deceased

Bishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1814BornShkodrŽ
30 Jul 184733.1AppointedBishop of Pult, Albania
30 Nov 184733.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pult, Albania
1 Jun 185844.0AppointedBishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
27 Sep 186854.3DiedBishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania

MicroData Summary for Paolo Dodmassei:
Bishop Paolo Dodmassei (born , died ) Bishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}

  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1851
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1861
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 88, and Page 472

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013