Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Karl Pooten

Deceased

Archbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

Archbishop of ShkodrŽ


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1807Born
23 Feb 184437.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
23 Feb 184437.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Maronea
14 Apr 184437.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maronea
31 Aug 185548.6AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
15 Mar 186760.1AppointedArchbishop of ShkodrŽ, Albania
15 Jan 188678.9DiedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Karl Pooten (VIAF: 220625767)
Archbishop Karl Pooten (born , died ) Archbishop of Bar (Antivari)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAchen

  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 106, and Page 505
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 78, and Page 254
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1844, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017