Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Toma Jedrlinić

Deceased

Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1798BornCastelmuschio
30 Oct 182527.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 184244.1SelectedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
30 Jan 184344.3ConfirmedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
15 Oct 184345.0Ordained BishopBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
11 Aug 185556.8DiedBishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Toma Jedrlinić (VIAF: 305603164)
Bishop Toma Jedrlinić (born , died ) Bishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 317
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 28 Nov 2016