Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Urban Nikola Bogdanović, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Skopje

Titular Bishop of Europus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1806BornDubrovnik
8 Jan 183225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
30 Sep 184538.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Skopje, Macedonia
30 Sep 184538.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Europus
8 Mar 184639.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Europus
2 Jul 186356.7DiedApostolic Administrator of Skopje, Macedonia

MicroData Summary for Urban Nikola Bogdanović (VIAF: 305485629)
Bishop Urban Nikola Bogdanović O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Skopje

  • a priest for 31.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 190, and Page 337
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1846, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Dec 2016