Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Zelo

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1803Born
Jan 1826³22.9Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 185552.0SelectedBishop of Aversa, Italy
23 Mar 185552.1ConfirmedBishop of Aversa, Italy
25 Mar 185552.1Ordained BishopBishop of Aversa, Italy
11 Oct 188582.6DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Zelo
Bishop Domenico Zelo (born , died ) Bishop of Aversa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopVallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 136
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 28 Dec 2016