Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Magliuolo

Deceased

Bishop of Acerra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1829Born
5 Jun 185223.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 187243.0AppointedBishop of Acerra, Italy
3 Mar 187243.1Ordained BishopBishop of Acerra, Italy
1899¹69.9DiedBishop of Acerra, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Magliuolo
Bishop Giacinto Magliuolo (born , died 1899) Bishop of Acerra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrignano Maggiore, Diocese of Acerra
Ordained BishopCathedral, Aversa, Diocese of Aversa

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 72
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017