Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco di Nicola

Deceased

Bishop of Ischia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1818BornAversa
22 Dec 187153.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ischia, Italy
22 Dec 187153.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Alia
14 Jan 187253.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alia
3 Aug 187253.6SucceededBishop of Ischia, Italy
11 Feb 188566.1DiedBishop of Ischia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco di Nicola:
Bishop Francesco di Nicola (born , died ) Bishop of Ischia

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 298, and Page 325

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013